U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Blaine et al v. Benefis Health System et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • May 13, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 13, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • May 06, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Joinder - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 05, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • March 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 21, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 18, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 18, 2022: [Joinder in Motion - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Joinder]
  • March 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Status Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • March 17, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • February 22, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 08, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 07, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 23, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 23, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.