U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hendrickson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 02, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel on Appeal - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [USCA Order]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 26, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Sealed Document]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Exhibits - MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Witness List - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Jury Notes ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • February 16, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Jury Instructions ]
  • February 15, 2022: [Jury List ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • February 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • January 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 21, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 21, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 14, 2022: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • January 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [In Limine ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.