U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00092
  • Case Name: Matta v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • December 15, 2021: [Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2021: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.