U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Wittine v. Zavatski
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Objection to Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Directing Prisoner Payment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 08, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.