U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Gardipee et al v. State of Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Status Report Order]
  • November 18, 2022: [Status Report]
  • November 17, 2022: [Status Report]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 17, 2022: [Stay]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • February 03, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • January 04, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 28, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • December 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Transcript - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 08, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 03, 2021: [Transcript Designation Order Form - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 31, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 29, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • August 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 28, 2021: [Affidavit in Support]
  • August 27, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 27, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 27, 2021: [Appear]
  • August 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 27, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 26, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • August 24, 2021: [Certificate of Counsel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.