U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Ranches of the West, Inc. v. Christensen
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order Staying Case]
  • December 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 16, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 02, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • July 25, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • July 13, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Strike]
  • June 23, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • June 20, 2022: [Appear]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 03, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 02, 2022: [Status Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 27, 2022: [Discovery Hearing]
  • May 26, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Modify - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 15, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 10, 2022: [Compel]
  • May 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Statement - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • April 11, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 11, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • April 08, 2022: [Stipulation]
  • April 07, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • March 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • March 21, 2022: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • March 18, 2022: [Appear]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • February 02, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • February 02, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [~Util - Set Motion and F&R Deadlines/Hearings - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • January 26, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 18, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • January 18, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • January 10, 2022: [Answer to Third Party Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • December 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 21, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 21, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Remark]
  • December 20, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 12, 2021: [Third Party Complaint]
  • November 12, 2021: [Counterclaim]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Take Deposition]
  • October 05, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Discovery]
  • October 05, 2021: [Take Deposition]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2021: [Submission of Proposed Summons - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • September 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Service by Publication]
  • September 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • September 02, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 24, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.