U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:12-cv-00027
  • Case Name: Native Ecosystems Council et al v. Christiansen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Alter Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 06, 2021: [Response to Motion]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Alter Judgment]
  • August 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.