U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lucero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 11, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 25, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 01, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • December 01, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.