U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rouillard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 24, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 19, 2021: [Vacate]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • August 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.