U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wind Set
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Change Plea - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 15, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • January 14, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 04, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 03, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 09, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.