U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barlow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [USCA Order]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 11, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 09, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • February 18, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
  • February 17, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • February 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 02, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • August 26, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.