U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Paquin v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
  • January 07, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 29, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • November 29, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 12, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 12, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 26, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • August 26, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.