U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:07-cr-00117-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Tucker et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 06, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Vacate]
  • June 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • June 02, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Compel ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • August 27, 2021: [Compel ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.