U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ketchum
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • August 27, 2021: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.