U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:15-cr-00016-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lilley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • December 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • December 29, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • December 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.