U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00076
  • Case Name: Bentley v. Kijakazi
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • August 18, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
  • August 08, 2022: [Attorney Fees]
May, 2022
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Social Security Opening Brief]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2021: [Social Security Response Brief - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Social Security Opening Brief - MT]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Social Security Briefing Schedule - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Administrative Record]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.