U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cv-00090
  • Case Name: Cantu v. Lantis Enterprises, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 23, 2022: [Strike - SDM]
  • September 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Statement - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 29, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 24, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 05, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • July 06, 2022: [Sanctions]
  • July 06, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Letter]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
  • September 27, 2021: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.