U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:05-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Olson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 29, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • September 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • September 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • September 23, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • September 12, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 06, 2022: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 06, 2022: [Arraignment - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • July 08, 2022: [Indictment (Sealed)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.