U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00096
  • Case Name: Philips v. City of Missoula Police Department et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • May 31, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order to Show Cause -SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • August 30, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.