U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deshaw III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 24, 2025: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 21, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 10, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 04, 2022: [Response - MT]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 16, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • January 11, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 15, 2021: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.