U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pretty Weasel
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 03, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Case No Longer Referred]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • December 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • November 18, 2021: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 02, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 31, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 31, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • August 31, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.