U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Benbow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 01, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 29, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 29, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • September 28, 2021: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 27, 2021: [Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 24, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Order]
  • September 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 24, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • August 31, 2021: [Summons]
  • August 31, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.