U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Akers v. Conover et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Reconsideration]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Dismissing Case]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 29, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sanctions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Remand]
  • October 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Supplement - MT]
  • October 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Stay]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 16, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.