U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00093
  • Case Name: Person et al v. Tannerite Sports et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Certify - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 15, 2022: [Certify - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • July 13, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • June 27, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 26, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • May 24, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • May 20, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • September 01, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 01, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.