U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:08-cr-00008-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Burnett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • February 11, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • January 13, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • October 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 19, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • October 19, 2021: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.