U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Petition to Open Juvenile/Sealed Records and Order - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 09, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2021
  • October 31, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 28, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 01, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 01, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.