U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abbott et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 30, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 01, 2024: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Exhibits Returned/Disposed - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 14, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 18, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 18, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • May 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • April 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 19, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 19, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 18, 2022: [Revoke]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 04, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 19, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • January 19, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 28, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 05, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 03, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.