U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 26, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • July 26, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • July 12, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • July 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 28, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 12, 2022: [Psychiatric Report]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Letter - MT]
  • January 24, 2022: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Hearing]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 16, 2021: [Letter - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.