U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fulbright et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 16, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 16, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 15, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 03, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 01, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • March 01, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • February 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • February 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • February 19, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • February 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 13, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 29, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 27, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 27, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 22, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Vacate]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.