U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gopher
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 28, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 28, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 19, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • April 04, 2022: [Revoke]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [1 - Applicable Party Docket Entry AND Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • September 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 02, 2021: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.