U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Aills v. Bludworth et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice and Warning to Pro Se Prisoner - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • January 09, 2023: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • January 09, 2023: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 21, 2022: [Letter]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Supplement - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Order Withholding Consent - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • May 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • May 06, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 02, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 02, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.