U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perault
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 13, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • August 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 25, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • May 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 12, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 12, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 10, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Change Plea - MT]
  • May 04, 2022: [Competency Hearing - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • April 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 12, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Psychiatric Exam - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2021: [Substitute Attorney ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 03, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.