U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00097
  • Case Name: Blackcrow et al v. Lake County Montana et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • July 07, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • July 07, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 02, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed IFP Case - MT]
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Serve Complaint - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 28, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement - SDM]
  • October 22, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 03, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 03, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.