U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00098
  • Case Name: Bieber et al v. Bradshaw et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
  • March 25, 2022: [Stipulation of Dismissal]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 24, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • January 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • January 18, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Pretrial Conference - Initial]
  • December 02, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 26, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • October 04, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 29, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Dismiss - SDM]
  • September 07, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 07, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.