U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Haskett et al v. American Home Centers et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • October 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Vacate]
  • October 06, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 23, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Statement of Disputed Facts - MT]
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • September 09, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 02, 2022: [In Limine]
  • September 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 26, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 26, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
  • August 26, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • August 23, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 22, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 22, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 22, 2022: [Settlement Conference]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • August 18, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • August 18, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Mediation - MT]
  • August 09, 2022: [Mediation - MT]
  • August 07, 2022: [Transcript - SDM]
  • August 03, 2022: [Transcript Order Form - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines - SDM]
  • July 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 24, 2022: [Telephonic Scheduling Conference]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 22, 2022: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • June 21, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • June 21, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 16, 2022: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 25, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Telephonic Status Conference]
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 30, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 17, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Correction - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Disclosure Statement - MT]
  • October 14, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 12, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • October 06, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2021: [Remark]
  • September 08, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 07, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • September 07, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 07, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.