U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:06-cr-00102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mitchell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • June 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 13, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 07, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 04, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.