U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cv-00095
  • Case Name: Zurich American Insurance Company and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland v. Goldsteen et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • February 24, 2022: [Telephonic Pretrial Conference - MT]
  • February 22, 2022: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • February 17, 2022: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 10, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Consents to USMJ - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Clerk's Notice Upon Consent to USMJ - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • January 19, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • January 06, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 05, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Waiver of Service Executed - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 08, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.