U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shoots, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Petition/Order Modifying Prob/SRT/COR (Form 12B) - MT]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 07, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • March 29, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • December 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 10, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 07, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 25, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • October 05, 2021: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • October 05, 2021: [Revoke]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • September 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • September 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.