U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Currence
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Forensic Evaluation Report - MT]
  • August 04, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 30, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • June 30, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • June 29, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • June 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • September 17, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • September 09, 2021: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.