U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cr-00066-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Parisian
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Petition for Warrant or Summons and Order (Form 12C) - MT]
  • November 17, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • November 17, 2022: [Arrest ]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • August 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.