U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00066
  • Case Name: Boyd v. State of Montana
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 01, 2022: [Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 13, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Dismissing Case]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend]
  • January 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to Amend ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 02, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 05, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.