U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05173-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Wetzel
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • December 09, 2021: [Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.