U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-po-05176-1
  • Case Name: USA vs Lampley
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Final Payment Received (Updates CVB) - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disposition of Count (Updates CVB)]
  • October 08, 2021: [Disposition NEF (Updates CVB) - MT]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Vacate]
  • October 06, 2021: [Terminate Hearings - SDM]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Minute Entry - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • September 15, 2021: [Appear]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 10, 2021: [Citation Issued (Updates CVB)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Set Hearings (Updates CVB) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.