U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Belgarde
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Report of Offender Under Supervision (Form 12A) - MT]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
June, 2022
  • June 02, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 27, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 24, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • February 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 08, 2022: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • February 08, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 11, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • December 27, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 22, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order]
  • December 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • December 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Referring Motion]
  • December 09, 2021: [Change Plea - MT]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 08, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 10, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.