U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:21-cv-00067
  • Case Name: Kelly v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [USCA Mandate - SDM]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [USCA Order - SDM]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reopen Case]
  • February 25, 2022: [Reopen Case]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • December 08, 2021: [Findings and Recommendations - SDM]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order Setting - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Case Opening - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Complaint IFP/Prisoner - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.