U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Houle
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 16, 2022: [Judgment - SDM]
  • May 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • May 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Vacate]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 31, 2022: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 31, 2022: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • January 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Information - Felony - SDM]
  • January 31, 2022: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • January 11, 2022: [Writ ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [Telephone Conference ]
  • January 10, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
  • January 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 10, 2022: [Vacate]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
  • December 23, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • December 23, 2021: [In Limine ]
  • December 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 18, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 18, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
  • November 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 05, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 03, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • November 03, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • November 02, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 05, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • September 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • September 13, 2021: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • September 13, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.