U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:21-cv-00100
  • Case Name: McKain v. Safeco Insurance Company of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Satisfaction of Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Costs Taxed]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Application for Taxation of Costs - SDM]
  • August 25, 2022: [Judgment - Clerk]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment]
  • August 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Appendix - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • July 11, 2022: [Partial Summary Judgment - SDM]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Statement of Undisputed Fact - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • June 27, 2022: [Summary Judgment - SDM]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 16, 2021: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • November 24, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 23, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Statement - MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Statement of Stipulated Facts- MT]
  • November 22, 2021: [Joint Discovery Plan - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Preliminary Pretrial Conference Order - MT]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Brief/Response to Order - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 14, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 13, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Removal - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.