U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:18-cv-00064
  • Case Name: Friends of Animals v. Haaland et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [USCA Order - SDM]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
  • November 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 13, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.