U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cv-00069
  • Case Name: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Decaussin et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Mailing of Consent - MT]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Stipulated Motion - MT]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Stipulation Motion - MT]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Setting - MT]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Answer to Counterclaim]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines - SDM]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 29, 2021: [Counterclaim]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set Deadlines - SDM]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 06, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
  • October 05, 2021: [Amended Document (NOT Motion)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 04, 2021: [Affidavit of Service]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 14, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 14, 2021: [Complaint - SDM]
  • September 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.