U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00009
  • Case Name: Subpoena of South Broward Hospital District
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Case Transferred Out - District]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer - MT]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • November 01, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 01, 2021: [Reply to Response to Motion]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 20, 2021: [Transfer - MT]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 24, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 23, 2021: [Notice of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order - MT]
  • September 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice - MT]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • September 14, 2021: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • September 14, 2021: [Quash]
  • September 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Judges]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.